NE LB329 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to taxes imposed on the average wholesale price of gasoline
Title
Change provisions relating to taxes imposed on the average wholesale price of gasoline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM411 filed |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |