NE LB327 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate funds for an increase in rates paid to behavioral health service providers
Title
State intent to appropriate funds for an increase in rates paid to behavioral health service providers
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB327 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37191 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB327.pdf |