NE LB327 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for the expenses of Nebraska State Government for the biennium ending June 30, 2019
Title
Appropriate funds for the expenses of Nebraska State Government for the biennium ending June 30, 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 36-12-1 (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 36-12-1 (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 36-12-1 (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Communication |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO154 failed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO154 Reconsider the vote on MO153 filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO153 failed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO153 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Krist MO152 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Krist MO152 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Krist MO151 failed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Krist MO151 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Bolz MO150 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Bolz MO150 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Bolz MO149 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Bolz MO149 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Morfeld MO147 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Krist MO146 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Crawford MO145 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | McCollister MO144 withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | McCollister MO144 pending |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Appropriations MO143 failed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Appropriations MO141 failed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Morfeld MO147 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Krist MO146 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Crawford MO145 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | McCollister MO144 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Appropriations MO143 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Appropriations MO141 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Approved by Governor with line-item veto on May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 09, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 36-12-1 |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1369 withdrawn |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1369 filed |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Erdman AM1375 withdrawn |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO127 withdrawn |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO127 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Erdman AM1375 pending |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Erdman AM1375 filed |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File pending |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST30 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Erdman AM1288 lost |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Erdman AM1288 filed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1233 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA71 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA70 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1231 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1222 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1229 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1224 withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Craighead AM1255 lost |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1193 adopted |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1193 filed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1279 adopted |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1279 filed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1277 adopted |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Bolz MO118 prevailed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Bolz MO118 pending |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Bolz MO118 Reconsider the vote on AM1277 filed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1277 lost |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Stinner AM1277 filed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER83 adopted |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Wayne AM1229 filed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Craighead AM1255 filed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER83 filed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER83 |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Speaker Major Proposal |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1233 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1231 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA71 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA70 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Wayne AM1224 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1222 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Appropriations AM590 adopted |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Scheer MO112 prevailed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Scheer MO112 Invoke cloture filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO111 failed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO111 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO110 failed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO110 pending |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO110 Reconsider the vote on AM1198 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO109 withdrawn |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO109 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1198 lost |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO108 withdrawn |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO108 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1198 pending |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Linehan AM1150 withdrawn |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Friesen AM1155 lost |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1198 filed |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Friesen AM1155 pending |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Appropriations AM590 pending |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Linehan AM1150 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM1155 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Appropriations AM590 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM590 |
2017-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |