NE LB322 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Placed on Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the School Safety and Security Reporting System Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the School Safety and Security Reporting System Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Legislature - Williams AM718 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Legislature - Education AM464 adopted (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2021-04-08LegislatureHansen, M. name added
2021-04-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2021-04-06LegislatureWilliams AM718 adopted
2021-04-06LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER22 adopted
2021-03-22LegislatureWilliams AM718 filed
2021-03-18LegislatureBlood name added
2021-03-16LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER22 filed
2021-03-16LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER22
2021-03-12LegislatureHunt name added
2021-03-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-03-11LegislatureEducation AM464 adopted
2021-03-09LegislatureMurman name added
2021-03-09LegislatureEducation AM464 filed
2021-03-09LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM464
2021-03-03LegislatureWilliams priority bill
2021-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 09, 2021
2021-01-15LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2021-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=44216
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LB322.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Final/LB322.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM464.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/ER22.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM718.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/SI/LB322.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB322_20210208-073234.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/CS/LB322.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB322_20210406-152036.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6250
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6251
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6489

Bill Comments

feedback