NE LB32 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for issuers of medicare supplement insurance policies or certificates relating to coverage of individuals under sixty-five years of age who are eligible for medicare by reason of disability or end-stage renal disease
Title
Change requirements for issuers of medicare supplement insurance policies or certificates relating to coverage of individuals under sixty-five years of age who are eligible for medicare by reason of disability or end-stage renal disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Hunt AM1859 filed |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Hunt AM1858 filed |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Correction |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |