NE LB319 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Hunt name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Hunt name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create funds, transfer funds from the Cash Reserve Fund, and provide for child care funding
Title
Create funds, transfer funds from the Cash Reserve Fund, and provide for child care funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |