NE LB317 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for Nebraska History license plates and powers and duties for the Nebraska State Historical Society
Title
Provide for Nebraska History license plates and powers and duties for the Nebraska State Historical Society
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 39-0-10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM398 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM398 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 39-0-10 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM398 adopted |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM398 filed |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM398 |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |