NE LB317 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a relevy or reassessment of a special assessment for cities of the second class or villages as prescribed
Title
Provide for a relevy or reassessment of a special assessment for cities of the second class or villages as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM19 adopted |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM19 filed |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM19 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |