NE LB316 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB316 amended into LB496 by AM1274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB316 amended into LB496 by AM1274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to limitations for a postconviction relief action
Title
Change provisions relating to limitations for a postconviction relief action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB316 amended into LB496 by AM1274 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM354 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM354 |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |