NE LB314 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Remote Seller Sales Tax Collection Act and change revenue and taxation provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Remote Seller Sales Tax Collection Act and change revenue and taxation provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2019
2019-01-28LegislatureHalloran name added
2019-01-25LegislaturePansing Brooks name added
2019-01-18LegislatureBrandt name added
2019-01-18LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2019-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback