NE LB309 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change an interest rate relating to property tax refunds
Title
Change an interest rate relating to property tax refunds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB309 amended into LB243 by AM977 |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |