NE LB306A | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Presented to Secretary of State on May 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Presented to Secretary of State on May 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Legislature - Brandt MO109 prevailed (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-7-4 (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-7-4 (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Presented to Secretary of State on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Certificate |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Communication |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor 32-16-1 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Brandt MO109 prevailed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Brandt MO109 Becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-7-4 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |