NE LB305 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB305 amended into LB262 by AM719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to grain warehouse storage rates and charges

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to grain warehouse storage rates and charges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB305 amended into LB262 by AM719
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-03-02LegislatureAgriculture AM526 filed
2023-03-02LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM526
2023-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2023
2023-01-13LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2023-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback