NE LB305 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Hansen, B. FA91 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Healthy and Safe Families and Workplaces Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Healthy and Safe Families and Workplaces Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21LegislatureHansen, B. FA91 pending
2020-01-21LegislatureHansen, B. FA91 filed
2020-01-21LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM592 pending
2020-01-16LegislatureChair ruled there had not been full and fair debate on AM592
2020-01-16LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM592 pending
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-03-07LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM592 filed
2019-03-07LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM592
2019-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2019
2019-01-17LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback