NE LB305 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allow veterans aid fund to be used for transportation costs for veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow veterans aid fund to be used for transportation costs for veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-06LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 05, 2015
2015-02-27LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 27, 2015
2015-02-27LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2015-02-27LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
2015-02-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2015-02-19LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2015-02-19LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER21 adopted
2015-02-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER21 filed
2015-02-10LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER21
2015-02-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2015-02-06LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM112 adopted
2015-01-29LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM112 filed
2015-01-29LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM112
2015-01-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 28, 2015
2015-01-16LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2015-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback