NE LB305 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to State Patrol retirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to State Patrol retirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-17LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2014-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill.
2013-06-05LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB305 amended into LB553 by AM802
2013-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 12, 2013
2013-01-22LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2013-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback