NE LB304 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt certain operations from the definition of a food establishment under the Nebraska Pure Food Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt certain operations from the definition of a food establishment under the Nebraska Pure Food Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-0-9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Agriculture AM990 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 01, 2019
2019-04-30LegislatureWayne explanation of vote
2019-04-30LegislatureM. Hansen explanation of vote
2019-04-29LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 29, 2019
2019-04-29LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-04-29LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 40-0-9
2019-04-29LegislatureChambers FA56 withdrawn
2019-04-26LegislatureChambers FA56 filed
2019-04-24LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-04-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-04-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER73 adopted
2019-04-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER73 filed
2019-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER73
2019-04-08LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-04-08LegislatureAgriculture AM990 adopted
2019-03-27LegislatureAgriculture AM990 filed
2019-03-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM990
2019-03-19LegislatureHansen, B. priority bill
2019-03-06LegislatureHansen, B. name added
2019-02-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 05, 2019
2019-01-17LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2019-01-16LegislatureBlood name added
2019-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback