NE LB301 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Transfer duties under the Boiler Inspection Act, the Nebraska Amusement Ride Act, and the Conveyance Safety Act from the Department of Labor to the State Fire Marshal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer duties under the Boiler Inspection Act, the Nebraska Amusement Ride Act, and the Conveyance Safety Act from the Department of Labor to the State Fire Marshal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Lowe AM165 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM299 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 07, 2019
2019-03-04LegislatureWayne explanation of vote
2019-03-01LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 01, 2019
2019-03-01LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-03-01LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5
2019-03-01LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2019-02-22LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST6
2019-02-13LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-02-13LegislatureLowe AM165 adopted
2019-02-13LegislatureLowe AM165 filed
2019-02-13LegislatureLathrop AM299 adopted
2019-02-13LegislatureLathrop AM299 filed
2019-02-13LegislatureLathrop AM257 withdrawn
2019-02-12LegislatureLathrop AM257 filed
2019-02-08LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2019-02-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-01-31LegislaturePlaced on General File
2019-01-18LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 28, 2019
2019-01-17LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback