NE LB301 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer duties under the Boiler Inspection Act, the Nebraska Amusement Ride Act, and the Conveyance Safety Act from the Department of Labor to the State Fire Marshal
Title
Transfer duties under the Boiler Inspection Act, the Nebraska Amusement Ride Act, and the Conveyance Safety Act from the Department of Labor to the State Fire Marshal
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Lowe AM165 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM299 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Lowe AM165 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM299 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST6 |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Lowe AM165 adopted |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Lowe AM165 filed |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Lathrop AM299 adopted |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Lathrop AM299 filed |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Lathrop AM257 withdrawn |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Lathrop AM257 filed |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |