NE LB301 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB301 amended into LB203 by AM350
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB301 amended into LB203 by AM350
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for electronic notices of determinations of claims under the Employment Security Law
Title
Provide for electronic notices of determinations of claims under the Employment Security Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB301 amended into LB203 by AM350 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31078 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB301.pdf |