NE LB300 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change judges' salaries
Title
Change judges' salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1500 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Chambers FA68 lost (Y: 7 N: 24 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1500 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Chambers FA68 lost (Y: 7 N: 24 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1500 adopted |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO79 withdrawn |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO79 pending |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO79 Reconsider the vote on FA68 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Chambers FA68 lost |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Chambers FA68 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1500 pending |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1500 filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |