NE LB30 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-07 - Day MO112 Place on General File pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 5 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-07 - Day MO112 Place on General File pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 5 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to homestead exemptions for certain disabled veterans and surviving spouses
Title
Change provisions relating to homestead exemptions for certain disabled veterans and surviving spouses
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Day MO112 Place on General File pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 5 filed |
2024-07-30 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-07-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for July 31, 2024 |
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-07-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |