NE LB298 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB446 amended into LB298 by AM1498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB446 amended into LB298 by AM1498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create and repeal funds and provide, change, and eliminate sources, uses, and transfers of funds
Title
Create and repeal funds and provide, change, and eliminate sources, uses, and transfers of funds
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-2-1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Moser FA77 adopted (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Hilkemann AM1748 adopted (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Linehan FA67 adopted (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1498 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Moser FA77 adopted (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Hilkemann AM1748 adopted (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Linehan FA67 adopted (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1498 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB446 amended into LB298 by AM1498 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-2-1 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Moser FA77 adopted |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Moser FA77 filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO90 withdrawn |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO90 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM1748 adopted |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER107 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM1748 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER107 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER107 |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Linehan FA67 adopted |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Linehan FA67 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM1666 withdrawn |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM1666 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1498 adopted |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Speaker major proposal |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1498 filed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1498 |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |