NE LB295 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB295 amended into LB274 by AM667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB295 amended into LB274 by AM667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal prohibition on sale of alcoholic liquor to a person within a motor vehicle
Title
Repeal prohibition on sale of alcoholic liquor to a person within a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB295 amended into LB274 by AM667 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | General Affairs AM328 filed |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |