NE LB295 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Opportunity Scholarships Act and provide tax credits
Title
Adopt the Opportunity Scholarships Act and provide tax credits
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Revenue AM1418 pending |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Harr MO294 failed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO293 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Harr MO294 pending |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Harr MO294 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Harr MO291 failed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Harr MO291 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Quick AM1853 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Blood AM2052 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Smith AM2071 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Harr AM2121 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Harr AM2120 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Harr AM2119 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Harr AM2125 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1985 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1984 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1983 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1982 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1981 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1980 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1979 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1978 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr AM1977 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Linehan priority bill |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1893 filed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Revenue AM1418 filed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1418 |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Smith AM1421 filed |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Smith AM1420 filed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30926 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB295.pdf |