NE LB292 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit the use of eminent domain under the Jobs and Economic Development Initiative Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit the use of eminent domain under the Jobs and Economic Development Initiative Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-01-03LegislatureHoldcroft name added
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-01-31LegislatureHunt name added
2023-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2023
2023-01-13LegislatureReferred to Natural Resources Committee
2023-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback