NE LB292 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the State Department of Education
Title
Appropriate funds to the State Department of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB292 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 19, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37363 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB292.pdf |