NE LB29 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Approved by Governor on February 22, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Approved by Governor on February 22, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the use of certain funds by the Department of Environmental Quality
Title
Change provisions relating to the use of certain funds by the Department of Environmental Quality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Approved by Governor on February 22, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Presented to Governor on February 16, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-02-16 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | |
2011-02-14 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-02-03 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-02-02 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-01-25 | Placed on General File | |
2011-01-13 | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |