NE LB289 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change and provide provisions relating to sex offenses and domestic violence protection orders, provide for sexual assault protection orders, and change provisions relating to paternity of a child conceived as a result of sexual assault

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and provide provisions relating to sex offenses and domestic violence protection orders, provide for sexual assault protection orders, and change provisions relating to paternity of a child conceived as a result of sexual assault

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB188 amended into LB289 by AM599
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB178 amended into LB289 by AM599
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 22, 2017
2017-05-17LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 16, 2017
2017-05-16LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-16LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-05-16LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-05-08LegislatureVargas name added
2017-05-08LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST32
2017-05-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-05LegislatureMorfeld AM1331 adopted
2017-05-05LegislatureMorfeld AM1331 filed
2017-05-05LegislaturePansing Brooks AM1175 adopted
2017-05-05LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER39 adopted
2017-05-04LegislaturePansing Brooks AM1175 filed
2017-03-31LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER39 filed
2017-03-31LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER39
2017-03-29LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-29LegislatureEbke AM599 adopted
2017-03-29LegislaturePansing Brooks AM785 adopted
2017-03-29LegislatureMorfeld AM786 adopted
2017-03-28LegislaturePansing Brooks AM785 filed
2017-03-28LegislatureMorfeld AM786 pending
2017-03-28LegislatureMorfeld AM786 filed
2017-03-28LegislatureEbke AM599 pending
2017-03-28LegislatureEbke AM599 filed
2017-03-23LegislatureHansen name added
2017-03-07LegislatureJudiciary priority bill
2017-03-02LegislatureKolterman name added
2017-03-01LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-02-28LegislatureBrewer name added
2017-02-24LegislatureWayne name added
2017-02-21LegislatureHilkemann name added
2017-02-06LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 23, 2017
2017-01-26LegislatureMcDonnell name added
2017-01-17LegislatureMcCollister name added
2017-01-13LegislatureBlood name added
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback