NE LB286 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Flexible Loan Act and change provisions of the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Flexible Loan Act and change provisions of the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31020 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB286.pdf |