NE LB276A | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriation Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-19 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Legislature - Wishart MO1120 prevailed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 25, 2023
2023-05-19LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 19, 2023
2023-05-19LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2023-05-19LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
2023-05-19LegislatureWishart MO1120 prevailed
2023-05-19LegislatureWishart MO1120 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed
2023-05-19LegislatureFA152 pending
2023-05-19LegislatureCavanaugh, M. FA152 filed
2023-04-12LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2023-04-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2023-03-30LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2023-03-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2023-03-14LegislaturePlaced on General File
2023-03-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback