NE LB270 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Pharmacy Benefit Manager Regulation Act and require an audit under the Medical Assistance Act
Title
Adopt the Pharmacy Benefit Manager Regulation Act and require an audit under the Medical Assistance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |