NE LB270 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create and eliminate funds administered by the Department of Labor
Title
Create and eliminate funds administered by the Department of Labor
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER149 adopted |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER149 filed |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER149 |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |