NE LB269 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB269 amended into LB287 by AM2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB269 amended into LB287 by AM2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate obsolete provisions relating to redistricting and boundary changes after the 2020 federal decennial census
Title
Eliminate obsolete provisions relating to redistricting and boundary changes after the 2020 federal decennial census
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB269 amended into LB287 by AM2060 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2023 |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |