NE LB268 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to a certificate of convenience and necessity for a telecommunications company
Title
Change provisions relating to a certificate of convenience and necessity for a telecommunications company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Pending |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Hughes priority bill |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |