NE LB268 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change court and other provisions relating to medical assistance reimbursement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change court and other provisions relating to medical assistance reimbursement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 37-11-1 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 37-11-1 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 22, 2017
2017-05-17LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 16, 2017
2017-05-16LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-16LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 37-11-1
2017-05-16LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-27LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-25LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-25LegislatureKuehn AM1191 withdrawn
2017-04-25LegislatureKuehn AM1191 filed
2017-04-25LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER67 adopted
2017-04-21LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER67 filed
2017-04-21LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER67
2017-04-19LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-19LegislatureJudiciary AM618 adopted
2017-03-14LegislatureJudiciary AM618 filed
2017-03-14LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM618
2017-03-09LegislatureSchumacher priority bill
2017-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 01, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback