NE LB268 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Certificate
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Certificate
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the death penalty and change and eliminate provisions relating to sentencing
Title
Eliminate the death penalty and change and eliminate provisions relating to sentencing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - Legislature - Passed notwithstanding objections of Governor 30-19-0 (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 32-15-2 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 32-15-2 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Certificate |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Communication |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Passed notwithstanding objections of Governor 30-19-0 |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Chambers MO135 prevailed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO135 Becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on May 26, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 32-15-2 |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO130 prevailed |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO130 Invoke cloture filed |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | McCoy MO127 failed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | McCoy MO127 Bracket until April 16, 2016 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Kintner AM1284 filed |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO119 prevailed |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO119 Invoke cloture filed |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | McCoy AM1286 lost |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | McCoy AM1286 filed |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | McCoy AM722 withdrawn |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER85 adopted |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Coash AM1532 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 15-006 to Coash |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Nordquist name added |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER85 filed |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER85 |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Cook name added |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | McCoy AM721 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | McCoy AM720 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | McCoy MO41 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM754 adopted |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Kintner AM992 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Kintner AM991 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Kintner AM990 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Kintner AM990 pending |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Kintner AM926 refiled |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Kintner AM926 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | McCoy AM918 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | McCoy AM917 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | McCoy AM916 withdrawn |
2015-04-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM754 pending |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Kintner AM992 filed |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Kintner AM991 filed |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Kintner AM990 filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Lindstrom name withdrawn |
2015-03-20 | Legislature | Kintner AM926 filed |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | McCoy AM918 filed |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | McCoy AM917 filed |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | McCoy AM916 filed |
2015-03-17 | Legislature | Judiciary AM754 filed |
2015-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM754 |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Crawford name added |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM723 filed |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM722 filed |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM721 filed |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM720 filed |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Campbell name added |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | McCoy MO41 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-03-05 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2015-03-02 | Legislature | Chambers priority bill |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2015-02-19 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |