NE LB266 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to jurisdiction for municipalities to enforce ordinances
Title
Change provisions relating to jurisdiction for municipalities to enforce ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-02-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-02-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER30 adopted |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER30 filed |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER30 |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM122 adopted |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM122 filed |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM122 |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |