NE LB264 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Grain Dealer Act and the Grain Warehouse Act
Title
Change provisions of the Grain Dealer Act and the Grain Warehouse Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2023 |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |