NE LB26 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a sales tax exemption for residential water service
Title
Provide a sales tax exemption for residential water service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-2-6 (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-2-6 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Pahls priority bill |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-25 | Legislature | Pahls name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |