NE LB259A | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriation Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 39-4-6 (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 39-4-6 (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 12, 2017
2017-05-09LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 08, 2017
2017-05-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 39-4-6
2017-05-04LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-05-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-02LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-26LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-04-26LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback