NE LB259 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB526 amended into LB259 by AM933
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt and change competency and financial ability provisions relating to court proceedings as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt and change competency and financial ability provisions relating to court proceedings as prescribed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-3-5 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-3-5 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB526 amended into LB259 by AM933
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB395 amended into LB259 by AM933
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB145 amended into LB259 by AM933
2017-05-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 12, 2017
2017-05-09LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 08, 2017
2017-05-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 41-3-5
2017-05-08LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-26LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-25LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-25LegislatureHansen AM1186 adopted
2017-04-25LegislatureHansen AM1186 filed
2017-04-25LegislatureHansen AM1106 withdrawn
2017-04-25LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER66 adopted
2017-04-21LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER66 filed
2017-04-21LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER66
2017-04-20LegislatureHansen AM1106 filed
2017-04-19LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-19LegislatureHansen AM1082 adopted
2017-04-19LegislatureJudiciary AM933 adopted
2017-04-18LegislatureHansen AM1082 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureJudiciary AM933 filed
2017-04-12LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM933
2017-03-09LegislatureHansen priority bill
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 02, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureChambers name added
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback