NE LB258 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide opportunity for inmates to obtain state identification card or renew driver's license before discharge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide opportunity for inmates to obtain state identification card or renew driver's license before discharge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 17, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 44-1-4
2018-02-12LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-02-08LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-01-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2018-01-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-01-22LegislatureHansen AM1534 adopted
2018-01-22LegislatureJudiciary AM339 adopted
2018-01-11LegislatureHansen AM1534 filed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-03-01LegislatureJudiciary AM339 filed
2017-03-01LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM339
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 16, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback