NE LB257 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to cemeteries and abandonment and reversion of cemetery lots
Title
Change provisions relating to cemeteries and abandonment and reversion of cemetery lots
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST37 recorded |
2024-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST37 filed |
2024-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST37 |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER58 adopted |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER58 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER58 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2023 |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |