NE LB257 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a statute of limitations for claims relating to real estate brokerage services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a statute of limitations for claims relating to real estate brokerage services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 09, 2017
2017-05-03LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 03, 2017
2017-05-03LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-03LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-04-21LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-19LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-19LegislatureLindstrom MO89 withdrawn
2017-04-19LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER53 adopted
2017-04-18LegislatureLindstrom MO89 Bracket until May 18, 2017 filed
2017-04-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER53 filed
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER53
2017-04-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-05LegislatureHilgers AM502 adopted
2017-03-20LegislatureHilgers AM502 filed
2017-03-13LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2017-02-16LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 07, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback