NE LB256 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB256 amended into LB296 by AM1179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB256 amended into LB296 by AM1179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions related to insurance coverage of telehealth
Title
Change provisions related to insurance coverage of telehealth
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB256 amended into LB296 by AM1179 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA52 filed |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1176 filed |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1176 |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO418 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO415 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO419 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO417 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO414 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO416 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO413 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3 (f) filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Raybould name added |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Fredrickson name added |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Fredrickson priority bill |
2023-03-07 | Legislature | Brewer AM681 filed |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |