NE LB256 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Vacant Property Registration Act
Title
Adopt the Vacant Property Registration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2018-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO227 withdrawn |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO227 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Briese AM1752 adopted |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER104 adopted |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Briese AM1752 filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER104 filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER104 |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM452 adopted |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM452 filed |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM452 |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |