NE LB254 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Placed on Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Fair Chance Hiring Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Fair Chance Hiring Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM384 adopted (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-03-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-03-07LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER40 adopted
2019-02-26LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER40 filed
2019-02-26LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER40
2019-02-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-02-20LegislatureHansen, B. AM384 adopted
2019-02-20LegislatureHansen, B. AM384 filed
2019-02-14LegislaturePlaced on General File
2019-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2019
2019-01-16LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback