NE LB253 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for creation of a veteran justice program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for creation of a veteran justice program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Wayne AM3321 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2978 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 16, 2024
2024-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2024
2024-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2024-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 44-0-5
2024-04-11LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2024-04-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ST75 recorded
2024-04-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ST75 filed
2024-04-09LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST75
2024-04-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2024-04-09LegislatureHoldcroft AM3366 withdrawn
2024-04-09LegislatureWayne AM3321 adopted
2024-04-09LegislatureFredrickson AM3226 withdrawn
2024-04-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER113 adopted
2024-04-05LegislatureHoldcroft AM3366 to AM2978 filed
2024-04-03LegislatureWayne AM3321 to AM2978 filed
2024-04-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER113 filed
2024-04-02LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER113
2024-03-27LegislatureFredrickson AM3226 to AM2978 filed
2024-03-25LegislatureVargas name added
2024-03-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2024-03-21LegislatureWayne AM2534 withdrawn
2024-03-21LegislatureJudiciary AM2978 adopted
2024-03-21LegislatureLowe AM3160 withdrawn
2024-03-21LegislatureLowe AM3160 to AM2978 filed
2024-03-15LegislatureJudiciary AM2978 filed
2024-03-15LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2978
2024-03-05LegislatureSanders name added
2024-02-20LegislatureWayne name added
2024-02-20LegislatureWayne AM2534 filed
2024-02-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 23, 2024 on AM2534
2024-02-15LegislatureJudiciary priority bill
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-04-20LegislatureConrad name added
2023-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2023
2023-01-23LegislatureHardin name added
2023-01-12LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=49866
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB253.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Final/LB253.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Slip/LB253.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2534.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2978.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3160.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3226.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ER113.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3321.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3366.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ST75.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB253.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB253_20230207-140110.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB253.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB253_20240328-095104.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB253_20240404-151341.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB253_20240410-160801.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB253_20240411-112000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10501
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10502
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10811
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=11007

Bill Comments

feedback