NE LB25 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-31 - Notice of hearing for August 02, 2024
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-31 - Notice of hearing for August 02, 2024
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Prison Population Reduction and Property Tax Relief Act and provide for early discharge from parole and for recommendations for commutations of certain sentences
Title
Adopt the Prison Population Reduction and Property Tax Relief Act and provide for early discharge from parole and for recommendations for commutations of certain sentences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 02, 2024 |
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-07-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |